California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB441 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 25, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 19, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 22, 2016

Amended

Bill June 22, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill April 6, 2015