|
04/25/2016
|
Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2015
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/15/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 9:30 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2666.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 26. Page 2951.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 26).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on AGING & L.T.C. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/14/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 4. Page 994.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 816.) (April 28).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|