LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB475
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB475
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB475
Compare Versions
SB475 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB475 Amended September 4, 2015
SB475 Amended September 1, 2015
SB475 Amended August 20, 2015
SB475 Amended August 17, 2015
SB475 Amended July 6, 2015
SB475 Amended June 25, 2015
SB475 Amended May 5, 2015
SB475 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB475 Enrolled September 10, 2015
SB475 Amended September 4, 2015
SB475 Amended September 1, 2015
SB475 Amended August 20, 2015
SB475 Amended August 17, 2015
SB475 Amended July 6, 2015
SB475 Amended June 25, 2015
SB475 Amended May 5, 2015
SB475 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare