California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB475 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2015

Amended

Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015
Bill August 20, 2015
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 25, 2015
Bill May 5, 2015