|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 833, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5495.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 6011.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5949.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2943.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2896.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
April 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|