California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 17, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016