LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB488
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB488
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB488
Compare Versions
SB488 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB488 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB488 Amended August 19, 2016
SB488 Amended June 16, 2016
SB488 Amended May 17, 2016
SB488 Amended January 4, 2016
SB488 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB488 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB488 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB488 Amended August 19, 2016
SB488 Amended June 16, 2016
SB488 Amended May 17, 2016
SB488 Amended January 4, 2016
SB488 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare