|
10/09/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 717, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/09/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/16/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:45 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/10/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 28. Noes 12. Page 2707.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 22. Page 2697.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 19).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/02/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 1).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/10/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/04/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 11. Page 1018.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 725.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|