California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB533 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 9, 2015

Amended

Bill July 6, 2015
Bill June 10, 2015