LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB533
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB533
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB533
Compare Versions
SB533 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB533 Enrolled September 11, 2015
SB533 Amended July 6, 2015
SB533 Amended June 10, 2015
SB533 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB533 Chaptered October 9, 2015
SB533 Enrolled September 11, 2015
SB533 Amended July 6, 2015
SB533 Amended June 10, 2015
SB533 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare