Assembly
|
09/01/2016
|
From Assembly without further action.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 20. Noes 28. Page 6584.)
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (August 10).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for second hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/26/2015
|
August 26 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 30).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 9. Page 1215.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1101.) (May 26).
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
May 18 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2015
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 794.) (April 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 13 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2015
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|