California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB538 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 4, 2016
Bill June 29, 2016
Bill August 17, 2015
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015