LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB538
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB538
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB538
Compare Versions
SB538 Amended August 15, 2016
SB538 Amended August 4, 2016
SB538 Amended June 29, 2016
SB538 Amended August 17, 2015
SB538 Amended July 7, 2015
SB538 Amended April 16, 2015
SB538 Amended April 6, 2015
SB538 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB538 Amended August 15, 2016
SB538 Amended August 4, 2016
SB538 Amended June 29, 2016
SB538 Amended August 17, 2015
SB538 Amended July 7, 2015
SB538 Amended April 16, 2015
SB538 Amended April 6, 2015
SB538 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare