|
11/30/2016
|
Last day to consider Governor's veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/22/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/22/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 6056.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 19. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on AGING & L.T.C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 4. Page 2963.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2934.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 2901.) (January 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
Set for hearing January 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
April 29 set for first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HEALTH. (Ayes 8. Noes 3. Page 592.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and HEALTH.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|