LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB547
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB547
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB547
Compare Versions
SB547 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB547 Amended August 1, 2016
SB547 Amended January 26, 2016
SB547 Amended January 4, 2016
SB547 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB547 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB547 Amended August 1, 2016
SB547 Amended January 26, 2016
SB547 Amended January 4, 2016
SB547 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare