California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB547 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill January 26, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016