|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 773, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 25. Noes 13. Page 5494.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 5456.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Set for hearing August 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.Q. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5326.) Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/23/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 50. Noes 28. Page 6130.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 50. Noes 21. Page 5990.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/16/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/27/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and W., P., & W. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 27). Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/17/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1205.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1156.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 858.) (April 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
April 15 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|