California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 16, 2016
Bill May 17, 2016
Bill July 7, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015