LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB552
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB552
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB552
Compare Versions
SB552 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB552 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB552 Amended August 19, 2016
SB552 Amended August 15, 2016
SB552 Amended August 1, 2016
SB552 Amended June 16, 2016
SB552 Amended May 17, 2016
SB552 Amended July 7, 2015
SB552 Amended April 16, 2015
SB552 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB552 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB552 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB552 Amended August 19, 2016
SB552 Amended August 15, 2016
SB552 Amended August 1, 2016
SB552 Amended June 16, 2016
SB552 Amended May 17, 2016
SB552 Amended July 7, 2015
SB552 Amended April 16, 2015
SB552 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare