|
09/27/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 709, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5428.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 5900.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was read a third time, passed and ordered to the Senate. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/28/2016
|
In Assembly. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2016
|
From inactive file on motion of Senator Liu. Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/11/2015
|
Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Liu.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2960.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
From inactive file. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/13/2015
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/09/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 8).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/01/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1031.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/26/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2015
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|