LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB580
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB580
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB580
Compare Versions
SB580 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB580 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB580 Amended August 15, 2016
SB580 Amended September 4, 2015
SB580 Amended September 1, 2015
SB580 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB580 Chaptered September 27, 2016
SB580 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB580 Amended August 15, 2016
SB580 Amended September 4, 2015
SB580 Amended September 1, 2015
SB580 Introduced February 26, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare