California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB580 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2016

Amended

Bill August 15, 2016
Bill September 4, 2015
Bill September 1, 2015