|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 350, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2693.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/14/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/02/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1195.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1146.) (May 28). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
April 20 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 404.) (March 24).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2015
|
Set for hearing March 24.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2015
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/30/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 29.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/29/2014
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|