California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB61 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2014

Enrolled

Bill September 1, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill April 7, 2015
Bill March 11, 2015