California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB61 Latest Draft

Bill / Chaptered Version Filed 09/28/2015

 BILL NUMBER: SB 61CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 350 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 28, 2015 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 28, 2015 PASSED THE SENATE JUNE 1, 2015 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 31, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE APRIL 7, 2015 AMENDED IN SENATE MARCH 11, 2015 INTRODUCED BY Senator Hill (Coauthors: Senators Hertzberg, Leyva, and Vidak) (Coauthors: Assembly Members Bonilla, Cooley, Eduardo Garcia, Lackey, Levine, Lopez, Maienschein, Patterson, Rodriguez, Steinorth, Wagner, and Waldron) DECEMBER 29, 2014 An act to repeal and add Section 23702 of the Vehicle Code, relating to ignition interlock devices. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST SB 61, Hill. Driving under the influence: ignition interlock device. Existing law requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to immediately suspend a person's privilege to operate a motor vehicle for a specified period of time if the person has driven a motor vehicle when the person had a certain blood-alcohol concentration. Existing law authorizes certain individuals, whose privilege is suspended pursuant to that provision to receive a restricted driver's license if specified requirements are met, including the completion of specified periods of license suspension or revocation. Existing law also requires the department to immediately suspend or revoke a person's privilege to operate a motor vehicle if the person has been convicted of violating specified provisions prohibiting driving a motor vehicle under the influence of an alcoholic beverage or drug or the combined influence of an alcoholic beverage and drug, or with 0.08% or more, by weight, of alcohol in his or her blood or while addicted to the use of any drug, with or without bodily injury to another. Existing law authorizes certain individuals whose privilege is suspended or revoked pursuant to that provision to receive a restricted driver's license if specified requirements are met, including the completion of specified periods of license suspension or revocation and, in some instances, the installation of an ignition interlock device on the person's vehicle. Existing law does not permit a person who has been convicted of a first offense of driving a motor vehicle under the influence, with injury, to receive a restricted driver's license. Existing law also requires the Department of Motor Vehicles to establish a pilot program from July 1, 2010, to January 1, 2016, inclusive, in the Counties of Alameda, Los Angeles, Sacramento, and Tulare that requires, as a condition of being issued a restricted driver's license, being reissued a driver's license, or having the privilege to operate a motor vehicle reinstated subsequent to a conviction for any violation of the above offenses, a person to install for a specified period of time an ignition interlock device on all vehicles he or she owns or operates. This bill would extend the operation of that pilot program until July 1, 2017. This bill would make these provisions relating to the pilot program inoperative on July 1, 2017, and would repeal them as of January 1, 2018. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 23702 of the Vehicle Code is repealed. SEC. 2. Section 23702 is added to the Vehicle Code, to read: 23702. This chapter shall become inoperative on July 1, 2017, and, as of January 1, 2018, is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that becomes operative on or before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends the dates on which it becomes inoperative and is repealed.