Senate
|
02/01/2016
|
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
January 21 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/10/2015
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
May 12 set for first hearing.Testimony taken.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/09/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|