LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB617
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB617
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB617
Compare Versions
SB617 Amended January 14, 2016
SB617 Amended January 5, 2016
SB617 Amended January 4, 2016
SB617 Amended April 29, 2015
SB617 Amended April 6, 2015
SB617 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB617 Amended January 14, 2016
SB617 Amended January 5, 2016
SB617 Amended January 4, 2016
SB617 Amended April 29, 2015
SB617 Amended April 6, 2015
SB617 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare