California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Amended

Bill January 14, 2016
Bill January 5, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 29, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015