|
10/04/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 492, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
10/04/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2273.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/27/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2626.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/20/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/17/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 15).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/01/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1026.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 984.) (May 12).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
April 28 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|