LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB626
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB626
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB626
Compare Versions
SB626 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB626 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB626 Amended August 20, 2015
SB626 Amended April 16, 2015
SB626 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB626 Chaptered October 4, 2015
SB626 Enrolled August 31, 2015
SB626 Amended August 20, 2015
SB626 Amended April 16, 2015
SB626 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare