California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB626 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2015

Chaptered

Bill October 4, 2015

Amended

Bill August 20, 2015
Bill April 16, 2015