|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 797, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5427.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/17/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 5077.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/16/2016
|
Set for hearing August 17.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/15/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4954.) Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/11/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5778.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/01/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2015
|
Unanimous consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2246.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 2216.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/21/2015
|
Set for hearing August 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
07/06/2015
|
July 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/26/2015
|
Set for hearing July 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/23/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 1452.) (June 16).
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2015
|
Set for hearing June 16.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|