California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB657 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 1, 2016
Bill June 13, 2016
Bill June 23, 2015
Bill April 21, 2015