LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB657
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB657
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB657
Compare Versions
SB657 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB657 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB657 Amended August 1, 2016
SB657 Amended June 13, 2016
SB657 Amended June 23, 2015
SB657 Amended April 21, 2015
SB657 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB657 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB657 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB657 Amended August 1, 2016
SB657 Amended June 13, 2016
SB657 Amended June 23, 2015
SB657 Amended April 21, 2015
SB657 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare