|
09/29/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 809, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 5594.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 10. Page 6520.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 30). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5967.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/16/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/15/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (August 11).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/28/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 2.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/31/2016
|
June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/26/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 3. Page 2954.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 2935.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2016
|
January 19 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2016
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 2886.) (January 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2879.) (January 11). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/08/2016
|
Set for hearing January 12 in JUD. pending receipt.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2016
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2016
|
Re-referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2015
|
May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2015
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
May 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 725.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|