LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB661
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB661
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB661
Compare Versions
SB661 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB661 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB661 Amended August 19, 2016
SB661 Amended August 15, 2016
SB661 Amended June 28, 2016
SB661 Amended January 4, 2016
SB661 Amended April 13, 2015
SB661 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB661 Chaptered September 29, 2016
SB661 Enrolled September 7, 2016
SB661 Amended August 19, 2016
SB661 Amended August 15, 2016
SB661 Amended June 28, 2016
SB661 Amended January 4, 2016
SB661 Amended April 13, 2015
SB661 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare