California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB661 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 29, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill August 15, 2016
Bill June 28, 2016
Bill January 4, 2016
Bill April 13, 2015