|
09/28/2015
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 357, Statutes of 2015.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2015
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/03/2015
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:45 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/01/2015
|
In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 2721.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 27). Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/08/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
Referred to Com. on INS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/28/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1119.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2015
|
From special consent calendar on motion of Senator Jackson.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 884.) (May 4).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2015
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 729.) (April 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2015
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2015
|
Referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|