California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB667 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2015

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2015

Amended

Bill May 18, 2015
Bill April 6, 2015