LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB667
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB667
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB667
Compare Versions
SB667 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB667 Enrolled September 2, 2015
SB667 Amended May 18, 2015
SB667 Amended April 6, 2015
SB667 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB667 Chaptered September 28, 2015
SB667 Enrolled September 2, 2015
SB667 Amended May 18, 2015
SB667 Amended April 6, 2015
SB667 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare