|
09/26/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 649, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/26/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/08/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/29/2016
|
Urgency clause adopted. Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 5493.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 5456.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Set for hearing August 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5387.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/24/2016
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 6229.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Read third time and amended. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5952.) Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/08/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/29/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/13/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/09/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/08/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/25/2016
|
June 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/28/2016
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/27/2016
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 2. Page 2962.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 2935.) (January 21).
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/16/2016
|
Set for hearing January 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2015
|
May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2015
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2015
|
May 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2015
|
Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2015
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 920.) (May 6).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2015
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 732.) (April 21). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/08/2015
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|