California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB680 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill September 2, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 26, 2016

Amended

Bill August 19, 2016
Bill June 30, 2016
Bill June 9, 2016
Bill June 8, 2016
Bill January 26, 2016
Bill May 14, 2015