LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB680
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB680
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB680
Compare Versions
SB680 Chaptered September 26, 2016
SB680 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB680 Amended August 19, 2016
SB680 Amended June 30, 2016
SB680 Amended June 9, 2016
SB680 Amended June 8, 2016
SB680 Amended January 26, 2016
SB680 Amended May 14, 2015
SB680 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB680 Chaptered September 26, 2016
SB680 Enrolled September 2, 2016
SB680 Amended August 19, 2016
SB680 Amended June 30, 2016
SB680 Amended June 9, 2016
SB680 Amended June 8, 2016
SB680 Amended January 26, 2016
SB680 Amended May 14, 2015
SB680 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare