|
09/24/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 584, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/24/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5317.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Set for hearing August 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5217.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5903.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/11/2016
|
From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Waldron. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/30/2016
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 19. Noes 0.) (June 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/22/2016
|
June 22 hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/21/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (May 2). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/20/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
03/17/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
01/05/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/25/2015
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/11/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/30/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 844.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 648.) (April 15). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2015
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2015
|
April 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2015
|
Set for hearing April 8.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|