California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB683 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 24, 2016

Amended

Bill June 21, 2016
Bill June 14, 2016
Bill April 20, 2016
Bill January 5, 2016
Bill June 11, 2015