LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB683
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB683
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB683
Compare Versions
SB683 Chaptered September 24, 2016
SB683 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB683 Amended June 21, 2016
SB683 Amended June 14, 2016
SB683 Amended April 20, 2016
SB683 Amended January 5, 2016
SB683 Amended June 11, 2015
SB683 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB683 Chaptered September 24, 2016
SB683 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB683 Amended June 21, 2016
SB683 Amended June 14, 2016
SB683 Amended April 20, 2016
SB683 Amended January 5, 2016
SB683 Amended June 11, 2015
SB683 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare