|
09/28/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 774, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/24/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 5371.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 5317.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/23/2016
|
Set for hearing August 23.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/22/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5217.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/19/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/18/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 64. Noes 14. Page 5888.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/04/2016
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/03/2016
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 4.) (August 3).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/27/2016
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/23/2016
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 22).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/09/2016
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 9). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/02/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/18/2016
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/18/2015
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
04/13/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 1. Page 557.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 509.) (April 7).
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/19/2015
|
Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2015
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after April 1. Read first time.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2015
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|