California 2015-2016 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB693 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 27, 2015

Enrolled

Bill August 26, 2016

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2016

Amended

Bill June 27, 2016
Bill April 18, 2016