LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2015-2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB693
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB693
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2015-2016 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB693
Compare Versions
SB693 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB693 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB693 Amended June 27, 2016
SB693 Amended April 18, 2016
SB693 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 1 (Old)
SB693 Chaptered September 28, 2016
SB693 Enrolled August 26, 2016
SB693 Amended June 27, 2016
SB693 Amended April 18, 2016
SB693 Introduced February 27, 2015
Version 2 (New)
Compare