|
09/25/2016
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 623, Statutes of 2016.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2016
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
09/09/2016
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/31/2016
|
Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 3. Page 5570.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/30/2016
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 5538.)
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/27/2016
|
Set for hearing August 30.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/26/2016
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 5448.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
08/25/2016
|
In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/25/2016
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 51. Noes 24. Page 6276.) Ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2016
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 18. Page 5978.) Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/08/2015
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 29. Noes 28. Page 2976.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Williams.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/04/2015
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
09/01/2015
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/31/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/28/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 27).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
08/19/2015
|
August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/16/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) (July 14).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
07/07/2015
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/18/2015
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
06/17/2015
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on W., P., & W. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 17).
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/22/2015
|
Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and W., P., & W.
|
|
|
Assembly
|
05/05/2015
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2015
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 7. Page 880.) Ordered to the Assembly.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2015
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 779.) (April 27).
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/15/2015
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2015
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2015
|
April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2015
|
Set for hearing April 7.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/15/2015
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/02/2014
|
From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2014
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|